Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Veall, Martin Brian (CPSO#: 57334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9292 Highway 93
Midland ON  L4R 4K4
Phone: (705) 527-7959
Fax: (705) 527-1773
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Veall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Veall ( CPSO# 57334 )

Business Address:
9292 Highway 93
Midland ON  L4R 4K4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN BRIAN VEALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1988