Vedelago, Harry Raymond (CPSO#: 67807)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
664 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 3A4
Phone: (289) 799-2135
Fax: 289-667-0022
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARRY RAYMOND VEDELAGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEDELAGO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1996