Veenema, Christopher Tacoma (CPSO#: 90708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Square Doctors
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1331
Fax: (905) 455-5498
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Veenema Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Veenema ( CPSO# 90708 )

Business Address:
Queen Square Doctors
366 Main Street North
Suite 201
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 455-1331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER TACOMA VEENEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEENEMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011