Veenhuyzen, George Daniel (CPSO#: 74783)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Feb 2008