Veenstra, Fedde (CPSO#: 55007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Nov 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Nov 1984

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000-1415 1St Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: (519) 370-4044
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fred Veenstra, Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Veenstra ( CPSO# 55007 )
Dr. H. Lynn ( CPSO# 56249 )

Business Address:
Suite 2000
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 470-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Nov 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FEDDE VEENSTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEENSTRA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1984

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)