Veenstra, Jacob (CPSO#: 24552)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jacob Veenstra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 22 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2003
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 05 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 05 Nov 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 05 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Nov 2012
Summary:

On November 5, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jacob Veenstra committed an 
act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession. Dr. Veenstra admitted the allegation.  
 
With respect to Patient A: care provided in the diagnosis and treatment of the patient's pearly 
penile papules, as well as Dr. Veenstra's record keeping practices, were deficient and did not 
meet the expected standard of practice.  
 
With respect to a review of 24 patient charts during a College investigation, the College's expert, 
Dr. X,  identified the following major concerns in Dr. Veenstra's practice in her July and 
October 2010 reports: recordkeeping deficiencies, including illegible or incomplete records; 
concerns regarding prescribing, including combinations of prescription medications, prescription 
of multiple medications and changing of medications frequently; inadequate histories, physical 
examinations and investigations; use of potent biological agent without adequate screening or 
monitoring in one case; failure to follow-up test results; and failure to consult with or follow the 
advice of specialists.  
 
In November 2011, Dr. Veenstra's clinical supervisor, Dr. Y, reported to the College that he 
found no evidence of any documented activity that raised concerns or undue risk to Dr. 
Veenstra's patients' safety or wellbeing. Dr. Veenstra retained Dr. Z to review the charts of 
Patient A, as well as Charts 1 to 24. In his October 2012 report, Dr. Z opined that although Dr. 
Veenstra's practices with respect to record keeping, prescribing, and referrals to specialists 
demonstrate significant deficiencies and require improvement, he is not lacking in the necessary 
skills to practise successfully or to meet the standard of care expected of a general practitioner, 
and that the deficiencies should be remediable. 
 
The Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Veenstra's certificate of registration for a period of six months 
      commencing immediately. 
 
      the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Veenstra's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Veenstra  shall complete the Ontario CPD Consortium's Record Keeping 
            Course and Prescribing Skills Course; 
      (b)   Upon Dr. Veenstra's return to practice, he shall obtain a Clinical Supervisor or 
            Supervisors, acceptable to the College;  
      (c)   For a period of at least three months, Dr. Veenstra will only see patients in the 
            presence of the Clinical Supervisor, who will be present during Dr. Veenstra's 
            clinical visits, and who will conduct a contemporaneous review of those patient 
            charts. During the period of high supervision, the Clinical Supervisor shall 
            provide bi-weekly reports to the College. The period of high supervision will 
            continue until the Clinical Supervisor in his sole discretion agrees that the level of 
            supervision may be reduced to moderate supervision. The Clinical Supervisor 
      shall reconsider the need for high supervision after the first three months of Dr. 
      Veenstra's return to practice, and at the beginning of every month thereafter for so 
      long as the period of high supervision continues. If the supervisor believes that Dr. 
      Veenstra is ready to practise under moderate supervision, he/she shall provide the 
      College with a report addressing the practise concerns raised by Drs. X, Y and Z, 
      and explaining why Dr. Veenstra's progress under high supervision justifies a 
      transition to medium supervision; 
(d)   Following the period of high supervision described in paragraph (c) above, 
      provided that the Clinical Supervisor and the College agree that the level of 
      supervision can be reduced, for a further three months, at a minimum, the Clinical 
      Supervisor will engage in a period of moderate supervision, during which time he 
      will meet with Dr. Veenstra on a bi-weekly basis to review a minimum of 15 of 
      his patient records and discuss any issues or concerns arising therefrom. If, during 
      this period, Dr. Veenstra has fewer than 15 patient encounters in a specific 
      two-week period, the Clinical Supervisor shall review the records of all patient 
      encounters during that period. The Clinical Supervisor shall provide monthly 
      reports to the College; 
(e)   Following the period of moderate supervision described in paragraph (d) above, 
      provided that the Clinical Supervisor and the College agree that the level of 
      supervision can be reduced, for a further six months, at a minimum, the Clinical 
      Supervisor will engage in a period of low supervision, during which time he will 
      meet with Dr. Veenstra on a monthly basis to review a minimum of 15 of his 
      patient records and discuss any issues or concerns arising therefrom. If, during this 
      period, Dr. Veenstra has fewer than 15 patient encounters in a specific month, the 
      Clinical Supervisor shall review the records of all patient encounters during that 
      period. The Clinical Supervisor shall provide monthly reports to the College; 
(f)   The combined period of supervision set out in paragraphs (c), (d) and (e) above 
      shall not be less than 12 months; 
(g)   Dr. Veenstra shall fully cooperate with and abide by any recommendations of, his 
      Clinical Supervisor, including any recommendations that Dr. Veenstra participate 
      in further educational opportunities; 
(h)   Dr. Veenstra shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor to the 
      College, and by the College to his Clinical Supervisor, of all information 
      necessary to fulfill the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking and to monitor Dr. 
      Veenstra's compliance with the Order. This shall include, without limitation, 
      providing the  supervisor with the reports of any assessments of Dr. Veenstra's 
      practice in the College's possession; 
(i)   All costs associated with the Clinical Supervisor shall be at Dr. Veenstra's 
      expense; 
(j)   Following the period of low supervision described in paragraph (e) above, Dr. 
      Veenstra shall submit to a comprehensive practice assessment of his clinical 
      practice, at Dr. Veenstra's expense, by an assessor or assessors selected by the 
      College. The assessor shall report the results of the assessment to the College, 
      who shall determine on the basis of the supervisor and assessment report, whether 
      Dr. Veenstra can engage in unsupervised practice;    
(k)   Dr. Veenstra shall co-operate fully with the assessment of his practice, conducted 
      under this term of this Order, and shall  abide by the recommendations of the 
      assessor(s);  
(l)   Dr. Veenstra shall consent to the disclosure to the assessor(s) of the reports of the 
      Clinical Supervisor arising from the supervision, and shall consent to the sharing 
      of such information between the Clinical Supervisor, the assessor and the College, 
      as any of the parties deem necessary or desirable in order to fulfill their respective 
      obligations; and  
(m)   Dr. Veenstra shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of 
      his office(s), practice(s) and patient charts by a College representative for the 
      purposes of monitoring his compliance with the terms of this Order. 
              
the matter of costs be reserved and will be dealt with in a supplementary order. 
              
the results of this proceeding be included in the register.   
              
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): November 5, 2012