Vegas, Annette Lesley (CPSO#: 54144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6443
Fax: (416) 340-3698
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNETTE LESLEY VEGAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEGAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1985