Veinish, Shelley Lynn (CPSO#: 55800)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Centre For Geriatric Care
Room 1C11
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2621
Fax: (416) 785-2863
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELLEY LYNN VEINISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEINISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1988