Veinot, John Porter (CPSO#: 59883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Box 117
CCW Room 4121
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8294
Fax: (613) 737-8712
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PORTER VEINOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEINOT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1989