Veisman, Aneta (CPSO#: 32734)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain their medical record may contact: Suite 1005 25 Sheppard Avenue West Toronto ON M2N 6S6
Date Received: 19 Nov 2014


Instructions: Effective August 1 2013, requests for records may be sent to: Dr. A. Veisman PO Box 91173 Bayview Village Centre 2901 Bayview Avenue Willowdale, Ontario M2K 2Y6
Date Received: 14 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2015