Velamoor, Varadaraj Rajagopal (CPSO#: 54053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Dec 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information


Former Name: Varadaraj, Rajagopal (used until: 09 Jun 1989 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Osmania University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Psychiatrist Member Of Consent And
Capacity Board
10Th Floor
151 Bloor St W
Toronto ON  M5S 2C7
Phone: (416) 327-4142
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Velamoor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2009

Dr. V. Velamoor ( CPSO# 54053 )

Business Address:
151 Bloor Street West
10th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 2C7

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York


Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1988
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 1988

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 1988 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Varadaraj R. Velamoor's certificate of registration is restricted to the
            practice of Psychiatry.