Velastegui, Romel (CPSO#: 66905)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad de Cuenca, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 19 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013