Velayutham, Veerabadran (CPSO#: 84961)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jun 2006 to 24 Jul 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jul 2006 to 30 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007