Veldhoen, Richard Adrian Francis (CPSO#: 105975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: 613-533-2623
Fax: 613-533-6695
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD ADRIAN FRANCIS VELDHOEN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. VELDHOEN is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. VELDHOEN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VELDHOEN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. VELDHOEN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. VELDHOEN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. VELDHOEN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 25 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018