Veldhuyzen Van Zanten, Sander Jacob Olivier (CPSO#: 57328)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, Spanish

Education:University of Amsterdam, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006