Velianou, James Louis (CPSO#: 65197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 526-7616
Fax: (905) 527-4463
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES LOUIS VELIANOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELIANOU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993