Velker, Brenna Ann Market (CPSO#: 100642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thompson Medical Centre
130 Thompson Rd
London ON  N5Z 2Y6
Phone: 519-601-8621
Fax: 519-204-3122
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Velker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Velker ( CPSO# 93601 )
Dr. B. Velker ( CPSO# 100642)

Business Address:
230 Victoria Street
London ON  N6A 2C2

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
Room A4 901A
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENNA ANN MARKET VELKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016