Vellanki, Venkat Sainaresh (CPSO#: 99616)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mysore University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2012 to 24 Jan 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 25 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Nov 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 12 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Jan 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 19 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016