Vellathottam, Andrew G (CPSO#: 90562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13 Lapsley Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 1K1
Phone: (416) 754-9595
Fax: (416) 754-3946
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vellathottam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vellathottam ( CPSO# 90562 )

Business Address:
13 Lapsley Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 1K1
Phone Number: (416) 754-9595

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW G VELLATHOTTAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELLATHOTTAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011