Vellend, Hillar (CPSO#: 23423)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2015