Vemgal, Prakash (CPSO#: 78845)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Bangalore University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2003 to 07 Apr 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Apr 2003 to 31 Jan 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Dec 2005