Venance, Shannon Lee (CPSO#: 71101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Clinical Neurological Sciences
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3874
Fax: (519) 663-3328
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon L. Venance Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Venance ( CPSO# 71101 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Clinical Neurological Services
339 Windemere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3874

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON LEE VENANCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENANCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2004