Vender, Ronald Bernard (CPSO#: 57229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Charlton Ave East
Suite 701
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 524-2049
Fax: (905) 524-1152
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.B. Vender Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vender ( CPSO# 57229 )

Business Address:
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 701
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 524-2049

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 13 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD BERNARD VENDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENDER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987