Venier, Elisa Ada (CPSO#: 58254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 701
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 487-9309
Fax: (416) 487-9790
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

431 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1L5
Canada
Phone: (416) 368-6304
Fax: (416) 368-6638
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elisa Venier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Venier ( CPSO# 58254 )

Business Address:
Suite 701
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 487-9309

Business Address:
431 King Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1L5
Phone Number: (416) 368-6304

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISA ADA VENIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988