Venkatesan, Bogeswari (CPSO#: 54963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Venkatesan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Venkatesan ( CPSO# 54963 )
Dr. V. Venkatesan ( CPSO# 54592 )

Business Address:
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 642-7699

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOGESWARI VENKATESAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENKATESAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1987