Venkatesh, Govindarajan (CPSO#: 61600)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil, Telugu

Education:University of Madras, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
436 Morris Drive
Americus
Georgia
americus GA  31719
United States
Phone: 6078572779

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Georgia
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GOVINDARAJAN VENKATESH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENKATESH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1998 to 31 Aug 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1995