Venkateswaran, Sunita (CPSO#: 76352)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Tamil

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Neurology
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sunita Venkateswaran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Venkateswaran ( CPSO# 76352 )

Business Address:
Division of Neurology
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNITA VENKATESWARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENKATESWARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 25 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2009