Ventureyra, Enrique Carlos Garcia (CPSO#: 30563)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:National University of La Plata, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012