Verbeek, Johannes Herbertus (CPSO#: 22494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Dec 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Paediatric Associates
651 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8T4
Phone: (705) 264-3599
Fax: (705) 264-7130
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHANNES HERBERTUS VERBEEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERBEEK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1969