Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Verchere, Cynthia Gay (CPSO#: 68624)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1995