Verduyn, Ashley Margaret (CPSO#: 82425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Health Care
3276 St Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone: 416 285 3666 Ext. 4116
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Verduyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Verduyn ( CPSO# 82425 )

Business Address:
Providence Health Care
3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone Number: (416) 285-3666

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Mar 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEY MARGARET VERDUYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERDUYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2008