Verduyn, Robin Frances (CPSO#: 88551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehab
Lyndhurst Hospital
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Verduyn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Verduyn ( CPSO# 88551 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab
Lyndhurst Hospital
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Lyndhurst Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN FRANCES VERDUYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERDUYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010