Vereshack, Paul (CPSO#: 19251)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 1994

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 Oct 1991
Summary:

 In October 1991, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Vereshack guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Vereshack's licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 09 Oct 1992
Hearing Date(s): 21 Oct 1991