Verhoeff, Nicolaas Paul Leonard Gerrit (CPSO#: 74459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French, German, Spanish

Education:Erasmus University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Centre for Geriatric Care
Department of Psychiatry
Kimel Family Building, Room 660
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 3358
Fax: (416) 785-2484
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLAAS PAUL LEONARD GERRIT VERHOEFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERHOEFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 05 Jan 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jan 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2002