Verma, Amol Anand (CPSO#: 95353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Medicine
30 Bond Street Cardinal Carter Wing
14-077B
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5431
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMOL ANAND VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015