Verma, Pradeep Kumar (CPSO#: 64281)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 25 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jan 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 31 May 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Nov 2000
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 25 Jan 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Nov 2001
Summary:

 On November 26, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Verma guilty of professional misconduct in 
 that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practise re sexual 
 assault of three patients as well as unlawfully prescribing narcotics and defrauding the Ministry 
 of Health in British Columbia.  The Committee ordered the Registrar to revoke Dr. Verma(s 
 certificate of registration immediately, a reprimand with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded 
 on the Register and costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 26, 2001