Verma, Raman Kumar (CPSO#: 86307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 6132745275
Fax: (613) 737-8957
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2420
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raman Verma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Verma ( CPSO# 86307 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMAN KUMAR VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2012