Verma, Rishi (CPSO#: 78526)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 26 Sep 2002 to 23 Oct 2002
Elective Trainee - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Apr 2007