Verma, Shailendra (CPSO#: 32546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70174
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1E-260 Metcalfe St
Ottawa ON  K2P1R6
Canada
Phone: 613-878-6935
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shailendra Verma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Verma ( CPSO# 32546 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Regional Cancer Centre
General Division
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAILENDRA VERMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERMA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1981