Vervaeke, Robert Joseph (CPSO#: 55278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 316
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone: (613) 728-5672
Fax: (613) 728-5672
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. J. Vervaeke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vervaeke ( CPSO# 55278 )

Business Address:
Suite 316
1385 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone Number: (613) 728-5672

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOSEPH VERVAEKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERVAEKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1988