Verville, Gregory Lorne (CPSO#: 61190)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2007