Veselskiy, Oleg Ivanovich (CPSO#: 83695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Ukrainian Medical and Dental Academy, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7L6
Phone: 705-876-5021
Fax: 705-876-5058
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

168 Brock Street
Kawartha Centre
Peterborough ON  K9H 2P4
Canada
Phone: 705-749-3906
Fax: 705-749-2778
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oleg Veselskiy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Veselskiy ( CPSO# 83695 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Kawartha Regional Memory Clinic
168 Brock Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2P4
Phone Number: (705) 749-3906

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLEG IVANOVICH VESELSKIY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VESELSKIY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2005 to 28 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 29 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 13 Feb 2012
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015