Vesprini, Daniel John (CPSO#: 78003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
Room T2 11
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4806
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vesprini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vesprini ( CPSO# 78003 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
Room T2 11
2075 Bayview
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4806

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JOHN VESPRINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VESPRINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2008