Vetere, Phyllis Marie (CPSO#: 66283)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007