Vethanayagam, Adrian John (CPSO#: 92089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Jubilee Hospital
Victoria BC  V8R 1J8
Phone: 250-370-8000
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dewart Vethanayagam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dewart ( CPSO# 89100 )
Dr. A. Vethanayagam ( CPSO# 92089 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Campus
Department of Medicine
Room LL 108
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIAN JOHN VETHANAYAGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VETHANAYAGAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Sep 2009 to 04 Oct 2009
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015