Vethanayagam, Dilini (CPSO#: 67132)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1997 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 17 Jul 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Apr 2004