Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Vetiska, Frantisek (CPSO#: 65022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Polish, Slovak

Education:Charles University At Plzen, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Paediatrics
Urgent Care Clinic
2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville ON  L6M 5A8
Phone: (905) 847-5437
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 01 Aug 2012

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANTISEK VETISKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VETISKA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993