Vettese, Antonio (CPSO#: 52251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 407
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-0097
Fax: (905) 820-6944
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Vettese Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vettese ( CPSO# 52251 )

Business Address:
407 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-0097

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTONIO VETTESE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VETTESE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 1984