Vezina, Kevin (CPSO#: 110067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 309077
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 09 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN VEZINA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. VEZINA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. VEZINA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. VEZINA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. VEZINA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. VEZINA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. VEZINA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018