Vezina, William Colin (CPSO#: 27226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Mar 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Nuclear Medicine
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 663-3424
Fax: (519) 667-3734
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
Nuclear Medicine
268 Grovenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100 Ext. 64328
Fax: (519) 646-6135
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Woodstock General Hospital
Nuclear Medicine
310 Julianna Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211 Ext. 2026
Fax: (519) 421-4241
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Vezina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Vezina ( CPSO# 27226 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Nuclear Medicine
Victorial Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 663-3424

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
310 Julianna Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211


Corporation Name: Romsa Warrington Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM COLIN VEZINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEZINA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1975